Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aleksander Cardinal Kakowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1862Born
30 May 188624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
7 May 191351.2AppointedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
22 Jun 191351.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
15 Dec 191957.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 191957.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
30 Dec 193876.9DiedArchbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Kakowski
Aleksander Cardinal Kakowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDebiny k. Przasnysza

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
  • a cardinal for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016