Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Lepa

Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

Titular Bishop of Regiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1939 BornLódz
18 Mar 196223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Łódź, Poland
4 Dec 198748.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland
4 Dec 198748.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Regiana
2 Jan 198848.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Regiana

MicroData Summary for Adam Lepa:
Bishop Adam Lepa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Łódź.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,549
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Feb 2014