Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacy Ludwik Pawłowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1776³BornBar Camenecen
17 Jul 180024.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Jul 180024.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 182852.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
23 Jun 182852.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara
15 Feb 182953.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megara
1 Mar 184165.1AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
20 Jun 184266.4DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Ludwik Pawłowski:
Archbishop Ignacy Ludwik Pawłowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 260, and Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013