Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Wladyslaw Oblak

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Warmia (Ermland)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1913BornBorzecin
29 Jun 193623.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 196148.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
20 Nov 196148.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius
1 Apr 196249.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius
28 Jun 197259.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
13 Apr 198269.0AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
22 Oct 198875.6RetiredBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
16 Dec 198875.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Wladyslaw Oblak:
Bishop Jan Wladyslaw Oblak (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013