Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Jarecki

Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Titular Bishop of Avissa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1955 BornSierpc
1 Jun 198024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
16 Apr 199438.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
16 Apr 199438.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Avissa
23 Apr 199438.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avissa

MicroData Summary for Piotr Jarecki:
Bishop Piotr Jarecki (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,423
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013