Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Damian Zimoń

Archbishop Emeritus of Katowice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1934 BornNiedobczyce
21 Dec 195723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
3 Jun 198550.6AppointedBishop of Katowice, Poland
29 Jun 198550.7Ordained BishopBishop of Katowice, Poland
25 Mar 199257.4AppointedArchbishop of Katowice, Poland
29 Oct 201177.0RetiredArchbishop of Katowice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Damian Zimoń:
Archbishop Damian Zimoń (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Katowice

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Katowice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1989, Page 304
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014