Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bronisław Jan Maria Dembowski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1927Born
23 Aug 195325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
25 Mar 199264.4AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
20 Apr 199264.5Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
25 Mar 200375.4RetiredBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
16 Nov 201992.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Bronisław Jan Maria Dembowski
Bishop Bronisław Jan Maria Dembowski (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstrów-Komorowo
Ordained BishopAssumption of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Włocławek, Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)
Death PlaceHospital, Włocławek, Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Assumption of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral Basilica, Włocławek, Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,975
  • d: CB, 16 Nov 2019
  • mn: CB, 18 Nov 2019
  • opd: CB, 20 Nov 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast