Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Dabrowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Tamascani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1931BornLiszkowo
25 May 195625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
20 Feb 198250.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
20 Feb 198250.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamascani
25 Mar 198250.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamascani
14 Feb 199159.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Dabrowski:
Bishop Jerzy Dabrowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013