Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mieczyslaw Leonard Pallulon

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1834Born
27 Feb 186025.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188348.3AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
3 Jun 188348.5Ordained BishopBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
2 May 190873.4DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Mieczyslaw Leonard Pallulon
Bishop Mieczyslaw Leonard Pallulon (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSmilgów
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St Petersbourg

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,801
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 497
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017