Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Krupa

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pelplin

Titular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1936 BornBraciejowa
14 May 196124.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Feb 198447.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
18 Feb 198447.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena
15 Apr 198447.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena
25 Mar 199255.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pelplin, Poland
15 Sep 201175.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Pelplin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Piotr Krupa:
Bishop Piotr Krupa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Pelplin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pelplin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013