Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacek Jezierski

Bishop of Elbląg, Poland

Apostolic Administrator of Gdańsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1949 Born
16 Jun 197424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
19 Feb 199444.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia, Poland
19 Feb 199444.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Liberalia
5 Mar 199444.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Liberalia
10 May 201464.3AppointedBishop of Elbląg, Poland
13 Aug 202070.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gdańsk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jacek Jezierski
Bishop Jacek Jezierski (born ) Bishop of Elbląg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlsztyn, Diocese of Warmia (Ermland)
Ordained BishopSaint Jacques l`Apôtre, Co-Cathedral, Olsztyn, Archdiocese of Warmia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Elbląg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,421
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 May 2014
  • aadm: Bollettino, 13 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Aug 2020

Quantcast