Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Kędziora

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga, Poland

Titular Bishop of Tucci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1934Born
3 Aug 195823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
11 Mar 198752.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
11 Mar 198752.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tucci
25 Mar 198752.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tucci
25 Mar 199257.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
5 Jan 201176.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
25 Dec 201783.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Kędziora (VIAF: 300701319)
Bishop Stanisław Kędziora (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeligów
Ordained Bishopcollegiale Assomption-S.Nicolas, Lowicz
Death PlaceWarszawa, Diocese of Warszawa-Praga

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,251
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 28 Dec 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast