Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Bernard Szlaga

Deceased

Bishop of Pelplin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1940BornGdynia
2 Jun 196323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
13 Jun 198848.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
13 Jun 198848.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mascula
25 Jun 198848.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mascula
25 Mar 199251.8AppointedBishop of Pelplin, Poland
24 May 199252.0InstalledBishop of Pelplin, Poland
25 Apr 201271.9DiedBishop of Pelplin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Bernard Szlaga:
Bishop Jan Bernard Szlaga (born , died ) Bishop of Pelplin

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,124
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Feb 2014