Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksander Kazimierz Bereśniewicz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1823Born
25 Jun 184522.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Aug 184724.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 185835.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
27 Sep 185835.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
27 Feb 185935.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Palaestina
30 May 187551.9AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
15 Mar 188359.7AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
Nov 1901³78.4ResignedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
4 Jun 190279.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Kazimierz Bereśniewicz (VIAF: 232856994)
Bishop Aleksander Kazimierz Bereśniewicz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzwelnie, Diocese of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St Petersburg

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 373, and Page 594
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017