Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonawentura Dobrogost Madaliński

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹Born
16 Nov 167148.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Płock, Poland
16 Nov 167148.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
27 Dec 167249.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
13 Mar 167451.1SucceededBishop of Płock, Poland
2 Jun 168158.4AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
11 Nov 169168.8DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonawentura Dobrogost Madaliński (VIAF: 161962498)
Bishop Bonawentura Dobrogost Madaliński (born 1623, died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGniezno

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 266, and Page 318
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 32
  • fn/mn/d: CB, 11 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast