Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Szymon Marcin Kozłowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev, Belarus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1819Born
23 Sep 184424.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 184425.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188363.3AppointedBishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
13 May 188363.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
14 Dec 189172.1AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
26 Nov 189980.0DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Szymon Marcin Kozłowski (VIAF: 102045195)
Bishop Szymon Marcin Kozłowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlita
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, St Petersbourg

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 175, and Page 351
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,883, Number 19
  • unk: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 318, Page Not Available

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast