Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Józef Górzyński

Coadjutor Archbishop of Warmia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1959 BornŻelechów
2 Jun 198526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
4 Nov 201354.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
4 Nov 201354.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Leontium
7 Dec 201354.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leontium
10 Feb 201555.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Warmia, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Górzyński:
Archbishop Józef Górzyński (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Warmia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Warmia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013
  • c34: CB, 27 Nov 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 156
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,989
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015