Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ryszard Karpiński

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lublin, Poland

Titular Bishop of Minervium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1935 Born
19 Apr 195923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lublin, Poland
19 Aug 198549.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland
19 Aug 198549.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Minervium
29 Sep 198549.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Minervium
31 Dec 201176.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ryszard Karpiński
Bishop Ryszard Karpiński (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRudzienko
Ordained BishopSts. John the Baptist and John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Lublin, Diocese of Lublin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lublin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 96, Number 8,229
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 97, Number 8,334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast