Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Lutsk

Dioecesis Luceoriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vitaliy Skomarovskyi, Bishop
  • Markijan Trofym’yak, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 28 October 1925
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lviv
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ukraine
  • Square Kilometers: 40,300 (15,565 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholic.lutsk.ua/
  • Mailing Address: vul. Katedralna 17, 43016 Lutsk, Ukraina
  • Telephone: (03322)7.46.59

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Lutsk (Łuck)
1404ErectedDiocese of Lutsk (Łuck) (erected)
1425Territory AddedDiocese of Vladimir (Wlodzimierz) (suppressed) Diocese of Lutsk (Łuck)
Diocese of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz)
8 August 1798UnitedDiocese of Lutsk (Łuck) Diocese of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz)
Diocese of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec)
1866UnitedDiocese of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)
Diocese of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz)
Diocese of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec)
22 September 1918SplitDiocese of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec) Diocese of Kamyanets-Podilskyi
Diocese of Luceoria o Łuck e Zytomir o Zytomierz
Diocese of Luceoria o Łuck e Zytomir o Zytomierz
22 September 1918SplitDiocese of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec) Diocese of Kamyanets-Podilskyi
Diocese of Luceoria o Łuck e Zytomir o Zytomierz
Diocese of Lutsk
28 October 1925SplitDiocese of Luceoria o Łuck e Zytomir o Zytomierz Diocese of Lutsk
Diocese of Zytomir

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Lutsk
1950330ap1951
199730,0002,254,0001.3%117181,666101836ap2000
200030,0002,169,1001.4%106161,87561736ap2001
200130,0002,169,0001.4%147211,42871336ap2002
200230,0002,168,6001.4%127191,57871336ap2003
200330,0002,167,5001.4%126181,66661436ap2004
200429,8502,165,8001.4%157221,35671236ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Apr 2014