Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmund Michal Piszcz

Archbishop Emeritus of Warmia, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1929 Born
10 May 195626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
21 Apr 198252.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
21 Apr 198252.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
20 May 198252.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
28 Nov 198556.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
22 Oct 198858.9AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
25 Mar 199262.3AppointedArchbishop of Warmia, Poland
30 May 200676.5RetiredArchbishop of Warmia, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edmund Michal Piszcz
Archbishop Edmund Michal Piszcz (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Warmia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBydgoszcz

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Warmia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Vatican Information Service, 30 May 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast