Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Smigielski, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sosnowiec, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1933Born
30 Jun 195723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Mar 199258.2AppointedBishop of Sosnowiec, Poland
30 May 199258.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sosnowiec, Poland
7 Oct 200874.7DiedBishop of Sosnowiec, Poland

MicroData Summary for Adam Smigielski
Bishop Adam Smigielski S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Sosnowiec

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrzemysl

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,977
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast