Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino Gomiero

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Adria-Rovigo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1924Born
4 Jul 194823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
5 Jun 198257.4AppointedBishop of Velletri e Segni, Italy
11 Jul 198257.5Ordained BishopBishop of Velletri e Segni, Italy
19 Sep 198257.7InstalledBishop of Velletri e Segni, Italy
7 May 198863.4AppointedBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy
11 Oct 200075.8RetiredBishop of Adria-Rovigo, Italy
20 Nov 200984.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Adria-Rovigo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Martino Gomiero (VIAF: 311259365)
Bishop Martino Gomiero (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Adria-Rovigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelnuovo di Teolo, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained BishopDuomo, Monselice, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Death PlaceSarmeola, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Castelnuovo di Teolo, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast