Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Meloni

Bishop Emeritus of Nuoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1935 Born
28 Jun 196832.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 198347.7AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
10 Sep 198348.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
16 Apr 199256.6AppointedBishop of Nuoro, Italy
21 Apr 201175.6RetiredBishop of Nuoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Meloni
Bishop Pietro Meloni (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nuoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nuoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast