Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerardo Pierro

Archbishop Emeritus of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1935 BornMercato San Severino
21 Dec 195722.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 198146.2AppointedBishop of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
2 Aug 198146.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
28 Feb 198751.8AppointedBishop of Avellino, Italy
25 May 199257.1AppointedArchbishop of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno, Italy
10 Jun 201075.1RetiredArchbishop of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Pierro:
Archbishop Gerardo Pierro (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Salerno-Campagna-Acerno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 11 Oct 2014