Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José (Giuseppe) Maritano, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1915Born
6 Aug 193924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
29 Dec 196550.7AppointedPrelate of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil
29 Dec 196550.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
19 Mar 196651.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
26 May 197863.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Castra Severiana
5 Mar 198165.9AppointedBishop of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil
31 Aug 198368.4ResignedBishop of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil
27 Dec 199277.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José (Giuseppe) Maritano
Bishop José (Giuseppe) Maritano P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Macapá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCumiana, Italy

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast