Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alghero-Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1916BornScano di Montiferro
6 Jan 193922.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 197558.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oristano, Italy
25 Apr 197558.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Risinium
22 Jun 197559.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Risinium
23 May 197963.0AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
23 May 197963.0AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
30 Sep 198670.4AppointedBishop of Alghero-Bosa, Italy
18 Feb 199376.8RetiredBishop of Alghero-Bosa, Italy
16 Jan 200083.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Alghero-Bosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pes:
Bishop Giovanni Pes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alghero-Bosa

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013