Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Campagna

Deceased

Bishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1923Born
8 Dec 194522.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 197854.8AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
8 Apr 197854.8AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
14 May 197854.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
30 Sep 198663.2AppointedBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy
10 Dec 199067.4DiedBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Campagna
Bishop Angelo Campagna (born , died ) Bishop of Alife-Caiazzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Tecla

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1991, Page 1,118
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast