Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gilberto Pereira Lopes

Archbishop Emeritus of Campinas, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1927 BornSanta Lucia
14 Dec 194922.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 196639.7AppointedBishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
18 Dec 196639.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ipameri, Goias, Brazil
19 Dec 197548.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Dec 197548.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aurusuliana
10 Feb 198255.0SucceededArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
2 Jun 200477.3RetiredArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Pereira Lopes:
Archbishop Gilberto Pereira Lopes (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Campinas

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Campinas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014