Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giocondo Maria Grotti, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Prelate of Acre e Purus, Acre, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Thunigaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1928Born
7 Jun 195224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
16 Nov 196234.6AppointedPrelate of Acre e Purus, Acre, Brazil
8 Jul 196537.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunigaba
22 Aug 196537.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thunigaba
28 Sep 197143.5DiedPrelate of Acre e Purus, Acre, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Giocondo Maria Grotti
Bishop Giocondo Maria Grotti O.S.M. (born , died ) Prelate of Acre e Purus

EventPlace
Birth PlacePieve di Budrio, Italy

  • a priest for 19.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast