Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuele Catarinicchia

Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1926 BornPartinico
2 Apr 194922.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 197852.3AppointedBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
17 Dec 197852.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cefal¨, Italy
7 Dec 198761.4AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
15 Nov 200276.3RetiredBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emanuele Catarinicchia:
Bishop Emanuele Catarinicchia (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mazara del Vallo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013