Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottorino Pietro Alberti

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1927Born
18 Mar 195628.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nuoro, Italy
9 Aug 197345.6AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
9 Aug 197345.6AppointedBishop of Norcia, Italy
8 Sep 197345.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
30 Sep 198658.7AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto-Norcia, Italy
23 Nov 198759.9AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
20 Jun 200375.5RetiredArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
17 Jul 201284.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottorino Pietro Alberti
Archbishop Ottorino Pietro Alberti (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuoro

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 17 Jul 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017