Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Peressin

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of L’Aquila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1923BornAzzano Decimo
30 Jun 194623.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 198359.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
29 Jun 198360.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
31 Dec 198360.6SucceededArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
6 Jun 199875.1RetiredArchbishop of L’Aquila, Italy
11 Oct 199976.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of L’Aquila, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Peressin:
Archbishop Mario Peressin (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of L’Aquila

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013