Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franco Gualdrini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terni-Narni-Amelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1923BornFaenza
1 Mar 194723.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 198360.2AppointedBishop of Terni, Narni, e Amelia, Italy
22 Oct 198360.3Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Narni, e Amelia, Italy
4 Mar 200076.7RetiredBishop of Terni-Narni-Amelia, Italy
22 Mar 201086.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Terni-Narni-Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franco Gualdrini:
Bishop Franco Gualdrini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terni-Narni-Amelia

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013