Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Cozzi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1926Born
18 Jun 195023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Policastro, Italy
8 Sep 197649.7IncardinatedPriest of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
12 Sep 198154.7AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
12 Sep 198154.7AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
25 Oct 198154.9Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
15 Nov 198154.9InstalledBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
30 Sep 198659.8AppointedBishop of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy
13 Dec 200276.0RetiredBishop of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy
3 Jul 201386.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Cozzi (VIAF: 307412427)
Bishop Vincenzo Cozzi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLauria, Diocese of Policastro
Ordained PriestLauria, Diocese of Policastro
Ordained BishopLagonegro, Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro
Death PlaceTrecchina, Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Melfi, Diocese of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 3 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 15 Jan 2018