Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pisanu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ozieri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1921Born
19 Jun 194423.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 197856.9AppointedBishop of Ozieri, Italy
23 Apr 197857.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ozieri, Italy
27 Mar 199776.0RetiredBishop of Ozieri, Italy
10 Jul 200079.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Ozieri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pisanu
Bishop Giovanni Pisanu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ozieri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBolotana

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast