Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florenz von Wevelinghoven

Deceased

Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Apr 1364AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
7 Nov 1379AppointedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
4 Apr 1393DiedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Florenz von Wevelinghoven
Bishop Florenz von Wevelinghoven (died ) Bishop of Utrecht

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 346, and Page 491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast