Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Johannes Nicolaus de Korte

Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1955 BornVianen
10 Jan 198731.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Utrecht, Netherlands
5 Sep 198732.2Ordained PriestPriest of Utrecht, Netherlands
11 Apr 200145.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
11 Apr 200145.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
2 Jun 200145.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
18 Jun 200853.0AppointedBishop of Groningen-Leeuwarden, Netherlands
13 Sep 200853.2InstalledBishop of Groningen-Leeuwarden, Netherlands
5 Mar 201660.7AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
14 May 201660.9InstalledBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Gerard Johannes Nicolaus de Korte
Bishop Gerard Johannes Nicolaus de Korte (born ) Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,984
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2016
  • i: CB, 8 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Mar 2016