Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Gerardus ter Schure, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1922BornSteenwijkerwold
1 Jul 195129.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Oct 198462.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
4 Oct 198462.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sigus
1 Dec 198462.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sigus
31 Jan 198562.6AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
13 Jun 199876.0RetiredBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
11 Apr 200380.8DiedBishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Joannes Gerardus ter Schure:
Bishop Joannes Gerardus ter Schure S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013