Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hendrik (Henricus) van de Wetering

Deceased

Archbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1850Born
15 Aug 187423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Utrecht, Netherlands
8 Feb 189544.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
8 Feb 189544.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaza
24 Mar 189544.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaza
11 Jul 189544.6SucceededArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
18 Nov 192978.9DiedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Hendrik (Henricus) van de Wetering (VIAF: 81610969)
Archbishop Hendrik (Henricus) van de Wetering (born , died ) Archbishop of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHoogland, Archdiocese of Utrecht
Ordained BishopS. Vite, Church, Hilversum

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 283, and Page 575
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017