Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodorus Gerardus Antonius Hendriksen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Utrecht, Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Eumenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1907Born
24 Jul 193224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Utrecht, Netherlands
21 Jan 196153.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
21 Jan 196153.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
7 Mar 196153.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eumenia
9 Sep 196962.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
20 Dec 200194.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Theodorus Gerardus Antonius Hendriksen
Bishop Theodorus Gerardus Antonius Hendriksen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWehl

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,001, Page 748
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast