Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus Hendricus Josephus van Ewijk (Ewyk), O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Curašao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Camachus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1827Born
28 May 186941.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Curašao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
8 Jun 186941.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
26 Jul 186942.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camachus
17 May 188658.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Curašao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Petrus Hendricus Josephus van Ewijk (Ewyk) (VIAF: 281337598)
Bishop Petrus Hendricus Josephus van Ewijk (Ewyk) O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Curašao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWijk-bij Duarstede, Archdiocese of Utrecht, Netherlands
Ordained BishopCathedral, Utrecht, Archdiocese of Utrecht, Netherlands

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 175
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,869, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast