Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théodore-Herman Rutjes, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Mongolia {Mongolia Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1844BornArnheim, Netherlands
22 Dec 186622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
11 Dec 188339.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Mongolia {Mongolia Orientale}, China
11 Dec 188339.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
21 May 188440.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
4 Aug 189652.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Mongolia {Mongolia Orientale}, China

MicroData Summary for Théodore-Herman Rutjes:
Bishop Théodore-Herman Rutjes C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Mongolia {Mongolia Orientale}

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013