Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Mayer, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Byblus


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Nov 1517AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
13 Nov 1517AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
28 Feb 1518Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
5 Jul 1522DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jean de Mayer
Bishop Jean de Mayer O. Carm. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint-Omer
Death PlaceUtrecht, Diocese of Utrecht

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 133
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1518, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast