Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard Wantenaar, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Basankusu

Titular Bishop of Uzalis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1886BornSoest
25 Jul 190923.3Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
2 Feb 192740.9AppointedPrefect of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 Jan 194861.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzalis
8 Jan 194861.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Apr 194862.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzalis
3 Dec 195165.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Basankusu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Gérard Wantenaar:
Bishop Gérard Wantenaar M.H.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Basankusu

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013