Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe de Bourgogne

Deceased

Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Mar 1517AppointedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
28 Feb 1518Ordained BishopBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
7 Apr 1524DiedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Philippe de Bourgogne
Bishop Philippe de Bourgogne (died ) Bishop of Utrecht

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1518, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast