Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Teerenstra, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Doumé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1911BornBolsward, Netherlands
18 Jul 193725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
16 Mar 194937.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Doumé, Cameroon
16 Mar 194937.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bure
29 Jun 194937.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bure
15 Mar 195139.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Doumé, Cameroon
14 Sep 195543.9AppointedBishop of Doumé, Cameroon
13 May 196149.6DiedBishop of Doumé, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Jacques Teerenstra:
Bishop Jacques Teerenstra C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Doumé

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013