Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Groningen-Leeuwarden

Dioecesis Groningensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 26 November 2005
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Utrecht
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Netherlands
  • Square Kilometers: 9,205 (3,555 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bisdomgroningen.nl/
  • Mailing Address: Bisdom, Ubbo Emmiussingel 79, 9711 BG Groningen, Nederland
  • Telephone: (050)406.58.88
  • Fax: 314.12.40

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Groningen
12 May 1559ErectedDiocese of Münster
Diocese of Utrecht
Diocese of Groningen (erected)
1580SuppressedDiocese of Groningen (suppressed)
Diocese of Groningen
16 July 1955ErectedArchdiocese of Utrecht Diocese of Groningen (erected)
Diocese of Groningen-Leeuwarden
26 November 2005Name ChangedDiocese of Groningen Diocese of Groningen-Leeuwarden

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Groningen
1970128,1941,500,0008.5%1919728844515471999ap1971
1980145,6001,585,0009.2%6387150970174493101ap1981
1990145,9031,645,0008.9%3854921,585310232197ap1991
1999123,6001,700,0007.3%3328612,0264319085ap2000
2000121,0001,700,0007.1%3323562,1604269084ap2001
2001120,0001,700,0007.1%3122532,2644245084ap2002
2002120,0001,700,0007.1%3022522,3073235084ap2003
2003120,0001,700,0007.1%2822502,4003224584ap2004
2004120,0001,700,0007.1%2822502,4003224084ap2005
Diocese of Groningen-Leeuwarden
2006120,0001,700,0007.1%2722492,4484223084ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.8, 18 Feb 2012; data: 12 May 2012