Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johannes Cardinal de Jong

Deceased

Archbishop of Utrecht

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1885BornNes, Ameland Island
15 Aug 190822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Utrecht, Netherlands
3 Aug 193549.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
3 Aug 193549.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhusium
12 Sep 193550.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhusium
6 Feb 193650.4SucceededArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
18 Feb 194660.4Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194660.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
8 Sep 195569.9DiedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes de Jong:
Johannes Cardinal de Jong (born , died ) Archbishop of Utrecht

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
  • a cardinal for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015