Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sasbout Vosmeer

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

Titular Bishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548²BornDelft
1572²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 160254.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
9 Sep 160254.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Philippi
22 Sep 160254.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philippi
3 May 161466.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sasbout Vosmeer:
Bishop Sasbout Vosmeer (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 39, Number 202
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 4 Feb 2015