Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Goswin Haex von Loenhout, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1469AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
15 May 1469AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
29 Sep 1469Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
31 Mar 1475DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Goswin Haex von Loenhout:
Bishop Goswin Haex von Loenhout O. Carm. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 164
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013